WA HB1024 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Civil Rights & Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Civil Rights & Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a government database of law abiding owners of legal firearms.
Title
Prohibiting a government database of law abiding owners of legal firearms.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Walsh [R] | Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Luanne Van Werven [R] | Rep. Tom Dent [R] |
Rep. Vicki Kraft [R] | Rep. Bob McCaslin [R] | Rep. Matt Shea [R] | Rep. Morgan Irwin [R] |
Rep. Ed Orcutt [R] | Rep. Brandon Vick [R] | Rep. Andrew Barkis [R] | Rep. Jesse Young [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-01-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2018-12-06 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1024&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1024.pdf |