WA HB1019 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allowing residential marijuana agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing residential marijuana agriculture.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-10HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2021-02-09HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2021-01-26HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2021-01-22HouseMinority; do not pass.
2021-01-22HouseCOG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-01-22HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 10:00 AM.
2021-01-15HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 10:00 AM.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming.
2020-12-10HousePrefiled for introduction.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6950101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
69504013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6950505Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback