WA HB1019 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning state fire services mobilization.
Title
Concerning state fire services mobilization.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Dent [R] | Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Daniel Griffey [R] | Rep. Brian Blake [D] |
Rep. Mary Dye [R] | Sen. Shelly Short [R] | Rep. Larry Haler [R] | Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] |
Rep. Matt Shea [R] | Rep. Bruce Chandler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2017-01-26 | House | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-01-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety |
2016-12-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |