WA HB1016 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-2)
Status: Enrolled on April 20 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Delivered to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Making Juneteenth a legal holiday.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making Juneteenth a legal holiday.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 89 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-20HouseDelivered to Governor.
2021-04-15SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-12HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-09SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2021-04-09SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-04-07SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-04-02SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-04-02SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2021-04-02SenateWM - Majority; do pass.
2021-04-02SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2021-03-31SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2021-03-22SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2021-03-19SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2021-03-19SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2021-03-19SenateSGE - Majority; do pass.
2021-03-19SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 10:30 AM.
2021-03-10SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM.
2021-03-01SenateFirst reading, referred to State Government & Elections.
2021-02-25HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 89; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-02-25HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-02-25House1st substitute bill substituted
2021-02-17HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-02-09HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-02-04HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2021-02-04HouseAPP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-04HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2021-02-01HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2021-01-22HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2021-01-20HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2021-01-20HouseSGOV - Majority; do pass.
2021-01-20HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-13HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations.
2020-12-10HousePrefiled for introduction.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
116050Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1016&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1016.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1016-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1016-S.PL.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1016%20HBA%20SGOV%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1016%20HBR%20SGOV%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1016%20HBR%20APP%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1016-S%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1016-S%20SBA%20SGE%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1016-S%20SBR%20SGE%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1016-S%20SBR%20SGE%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1016-S%20SBA%20WM%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1016-S%20SBR%20WM%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1016-S%20SBR%20WM%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1016-S%20HBR%20PL%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1016-S%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123027&actionText=SGOV%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28234&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123027&actionText=APP%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28485&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123027&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-25-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1016&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123027&actionText=SGE%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28818&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123027&actionText=WM%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28996&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123027&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-09-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1016&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments 750

feedback