WA HB1016 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a finding of guilt prior to the forfeiture of private property.
Title
Requiring a finding of guilt prior to the forfeiture of private property.
Sponsors
Rep. David Taylor [R] | Rep. Matt Shea [R] | Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Cary Condotta [R] |
Sen. Jeff Holy [R] | Rep. Jesse Young [R] | Rep. Bob McCaslin [R] | Rep. Dave Hayes [R] |
Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Rep. Luanne Van Werven [R] | Rep. Vincent Buys [R] | Rep. Larry Haler [R] |
Rep. Brian Blake [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-01-11 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
2016-12-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1016&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1016.pdf |