WA HB1012 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Effective date 1/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the use of child passenger restraint systems.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the use of child passenger restraint systems.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-19HouseEffective date 1/1/2020.
2019-04-19HouseChapter 59, 2019 Laws.
2019-04-19HouseGovernor signed.
2019-04-16HouseDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-16SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-15HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-12SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 31; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 6.
2019-04-12SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-28SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-03-26SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-03-26SenateTRAN - Majority; do pass.
2019-03-26SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2019-03-25SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2019-02-11SenateFirst reading, referred to Transportation.
2019-02-07HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 71; nays, 25; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-02-07HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-02-07House1st substitute bill substituted
2019-02-05HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-01-23HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-01-23HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-01-23HouseTR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-01-23HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2019-01-21HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading, referred to Transportation.
2018-12-05HousePrefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1012&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1012.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1012-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1012-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1012-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=116969&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-07-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1012&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=116969&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-12-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1012&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback