WA HB1011 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-17 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-17 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Assigning counties to two climate zones for purposes of the state building code.
Title
Assigning counties to two climate zones for purposes of the state building code.
Sponsors
Sen. Shelly Short [R] | Sen. Dean Takko [D] | Rep. Lawrence Springer [D] | Rep. Vincent Buys [R] |
Rep. Joel Kretz [R] | Rep. Matt Shea [R] | Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] | Rep. Cary Condotta [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-09 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-17 | House | Effective date 7/24/2015. |
2015-04-17 | House | Chapter 11, 2015 Laws. |
2015-04-17 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-04-14 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-04-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | GOS - Majority; do pass. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Security. |
2015-02-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-02-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-02-05 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-01-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-01-15 | House | LG - Majority; do pass. |
2015-01-15 | House | LG - Executive action taken by committee. |
2015-01-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government |
2014-12-08 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |