WA HB1009 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning student health plans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning student health plans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: do pass (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-16HouseEffective date 7/25/2021.
2021-04-16HouseChapter 53, 2021 Laws.
2021-04-16HouseGovernor signed.
2021-04-13HouseDelivered to Governor.
2021-04-09SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-07HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-06SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 19; absent, 1; excused, 0.
2021-04-06SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-03-26SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-03-22SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-03-19SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-03-19SenateHLTC - Majority; do pass.
2021-03-19SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2021-03-17SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:30 AM.
2021-02-25SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
2021-02-23HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2021-02-23HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-02-23HouseAmendment ruled beyond the scope and object of the bill.
2021-02-23HouseAmendment ruled beyond the scope and object of the bill.
2021-02-17HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-01-14HouseMinority; do not pass.
2021-01-14HouseHCW - Majority; do pass.
2021-01-14HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM.
2021-01-13HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
2020-12-08HousePrefiled for introduction.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4843073Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1009&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1009.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1009.SL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1009.PL.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1009%20AMH%20KRAF%20MORI%20008.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1009%20AMH%20KRAF%20MORI%20009.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1009%20HBA%20HCW%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1009%20HBR%20HCW%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1009%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1009%20SBA%20HLTC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1009%20SBR%20HLTC%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1009%20SBR%20HLTC%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1009%20HBR%20PL%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1009%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1009%20HBR%20FBR%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123013&actionText=HCW%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28124&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123013&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-23-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1009&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123013&actionText=HLTC%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28842&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123013&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-06-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1009&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback