WA HB1008 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing sales of growlers of cider.
Title
Allowing sales of growlers of cider.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-29 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-09 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-09 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
2014-01-29 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-01-20 | House | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
2013-03-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2013-03-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2013-02-01 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-01-29 | House | OVER - Majority; do pass. |
2013-01-29 | House | OVER - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-01-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Government Accountability & Oversight at 1:30 PM. |
2013-01-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Government Accountability & Oversight at 9:00 AM. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Government Accountability & Oversight. |
2013-12-04 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6442 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-19 - Effective date 6/12/2014.