WA HB1007 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-01-26 - First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
Pending: Senate Health & Long Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the completion of supervised experience through distance supervision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the completion of supervised experience through distance supervision.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-22 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-26SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
2021-01-22HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-01-22HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-01-22House1st substitute bill substituted
2021-01-19HousePlaced on second reading.
2021-01-14HouseHCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-01-14HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM.
2021-01-13HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
2020-12-08HousePrefiled for introduction.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18225090Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1007&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1007.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1007-S.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1007%20HBA%20HCW%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1007%20HBR%20HCW%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1007-S%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123011&actionText=HCW%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28124&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123011&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=01-22-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1007&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback