WA HB1004 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-13 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-13 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Installing signs on or near bridges to provide information to deter jumping.
Title
Installing signs on or near bridges to provide information to deter jumping.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-13 | House | Effective date 7/23/2023. |
2023-04-13 | House | Chapter 54, 2023 Laws. |
2023-04-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-04-07 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2023-03-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2023-03-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-02-02 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2023-02-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2023-01-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2022-12-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5478 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 86 | 040 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 36 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 36 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 08 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
77 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
79 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
79a | 05 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
81 | 36 | 100 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |