VT S0354 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-05 - Signed by Governor on October 5, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to using Australian ballot for municipal meetings in the year 2021

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to using Australian ballot for municipal meetings in the year 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-05SenateSigned by Governor on October 5, 2020
2020-10-01SenateDelivered to Governor on October 1, 2020
2020-09-25SenateRules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2020-09-25HouseSenate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in
2020-09-25SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2020-09-25SenateHouse proposal of amendment concurred in
2020-09-25SenateHouse proposal of amendment; text
2020-09-25SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe
2020-09-25SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2020-09-25HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2020-09-25HouseRead Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
2020-09-24HouseThird Reading Ordered
2020-09-24HouseReport of Committee on Government Operations agreed to.
2020-09-24HouseRep. Mrowicki of Putney reported for the committee on Government Operations
2020-09-24HouseRead Second Time
2020-09-24HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2020-09-18HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations
2020-09-17SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2020-09-17SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2020-09-17SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2020-09-16Senate3rd reading ordered
2020-09-16SenateRead 2nd time
2020-09-16SenateNew Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading
2020-09-15SenateCommittee Bill for Second Reading
2020-09-11SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-09-11SenateCommittee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback