VT S0353 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 18 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to expanding the Front-Line Employees Hazard Pay Grant Program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to expanding the Front-Line Employees Hazard Pay Grant Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-25SenateUnfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2020-09-24SenateUnfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2020-09-23SenateUnfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2020-09-22SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-09-21SenateNew Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2020-09-19SenateHouse Proposal of Amendment
2020-09-19SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-09-18SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2020-09-18HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2020-09-18HouseRead Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
2020-09-18HouseRules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2020-09-18HouseThird Reading Ordered
2020-09-18HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Bancroft of Westford, Bock of Chester, Carroll of Bennington, Dickinson of St. Albans Town, Jerome of Brandon, Kimbell of Woodstock, Morris of Springfield, O'Sullivan of Burlington, Ralph Watson of Hartland, and Toleno of Brattleboro agreed to
2020-09-18HouseReport of Committee on Appropriations agreed to.
2020-09-18HouseReport of Committee on Commerce and Economic Development agreed to.
2020-09-18HouseRep. Myers of Essex recommended for the committee on Appropriations
2020-09-18HouseRep. Jerome of Brandon reported for the committee on Commerce and Economic Development
2020-09-18HouseRead Second Time
2020-09-18HouseRep. McCoy of Poultney moved to suspend rules and take up bill for immediate consideration
2020-09-16HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
2020-09-10HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development
2020-09-08SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2020-09-08SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2020-09-04Senate3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Hooker, Passed -- Needed 14 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 28, Nays = 0
2020-09-04SenateRead 2nd time
2020-09-04SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe
2020-09-04SenateCommittee Bill for Second Reading
2020-09-03SenateCommittee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback