VT S0348 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 3 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Senate message, Allowed to become law without Governor's signature July 2, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to temporary elections procedures in the year 2020

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to temporary elections procedures in the year 2020

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-12 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 115, Nays = 29 (Y: 115 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 73 of 145 to Pass -- Yeas = 57, Nays = 88 (Y: 57 N: 88 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2020-06-12 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 73 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 50, Nays = 94 (Y: 50 N: 94 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2020-06-10 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 73 of 145 to Pass -- Yeas = 50, Nays = 95 (Y: 50 N: 95 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2020-06-03 - Senate - Floor amendment # THIRD disagreed to on roll call, requested by Senator Benning, Failed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 5, Nays = 24 (Y: 5 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-06-03 - Senate - Floor amendment # SECOND agreed to on roll call, requested by Senator Collamore, Passed -- Needed 14 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 18, Nays = 10 (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Senate - Floor amendment # FIRST disagreed to on roll call, requested by Senator White, Failed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 7, Nays = 22 (Y: 7 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Roll Call, requested by Senator Benning,  Passed -- Needed 14 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 21, Nays = 7 (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-26HouseSenate message, Allowed to become law without Governor's signature July 2, 2020
2020-07-02SenateAllowed to become law without signature of Governor on July 2, 2020
2020-06-26SenateDelivered to Governor on June 26, 2020
2020-06-12HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 115, Nays = 29
2020-06-10HouseThird Reading Ordered
2020-06-17SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2020-06-17SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence
2020-06-12HouseRep. Donahue of Northfield demanded yeas and nays
2020-06-12HouseRead Third time and Passed in Concurrence
2020-06-12HouseRoll Call Results Failed -- Needed 73 of 145 to Pass -- Yeas = 57, Nays = 88
2020-06-12HouseRep. McCoy of Poultney demanded yeas and nays
2020-06-12HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Scheuermann of Stowe, Shaw of Pittsford, and Leffler of Enosburgh disagreed to
2020-06-12HouseRoll Call Results Failed -- Needed 73 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 50, Nays = 94
2020-06-12HouseRep. Beck of St. Johnsbury demanded yeas and nays
2020-06-12HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Beck of St. Johnsbury, Canfield of Fair Haven, and Mattos of Milton disagreed to
2020-06-10HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Myers of Essex, Donahue of Northfield, Goslant of Northfield, Gregoire of Fairfield, Morrissey of Bennington, Quimby of Concord, Savage of Swanton, and Toof of St. Albans Town disagreed to
2020-06-10HouseRoll Call Results Failed -- Needed 73 of 145 to Pass -- Yeas = 50, Nays = 95
2020-06-10HouseRep. Gregoire of Fairfield demanded yeas and nays
2020-06-10HouseRep. Copeland Hanzas of Bradford reported for the committee on Government Operations
2020-06-10HouseRead Second Time
2020-06-05HouseReferred to the Committee on Government Operations
2020-06-05HouseCommittee Bill read first time
2020-06-03SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2020-06-03SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2020-06-03SenateFloor amendment # THIRD disagreed to on roll call, requested by Senator Benning, Failed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 5, Nays = 24
2020-06-03SenateFloor amendment # SECOND agreed to on roll call, requested by Senator Collamore, Passed -- Needed 14 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 18, Nays = 10
2020-06-03SenateFloor amendment # FIRST disagreed to on roll call, requested by Senator White, Failed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 7, Nays = 22
2020-06-03SenateQuestion divided on demand of Senator Benning
2020-06-03SenateRecommendation of amendment by Senator(s) Benning, text
2020-06-02SenateRoll Call, requested by Senator Benning,  Passed -- Needed 14 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 21, Nays = 7
2020-06-02Senate3rd reading ordered
2020-06-03SenatePending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Benning
2020-06-03SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2020-06-02SenateRead 2nd time
2020-06-02SenateNew Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading
2020-05-29SenateCommittee Bill for Second Reading
2020-05-29SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-05-28SenateCommittee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48

Vermont State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/status/2020/S.348
Texthttps://legislature.vermont.gov/Documents/2020/Docs/BILLS/S-0348/S-0348%20As%20Introduced.pdf
Texthttps://legislature.vermont.gov/Documents/2020/Docs/BILLS/S-0348/S-0348%20As%20passed%20by%20the%20Senate%20Official.pdf
Texthttps://legislature.vermont.gov/Documents/2020/Docs/BILLS/S-0348/S-0348%20As%20Passed%20by%20Both%20House%20and%20Senate%20Official.pdf
Texthttps://legislature.vermont.gov/Documents/2020/Docs/ACTS/ACT135/ACT135%20As%20Enacted.pdf
Roll Callhttps://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2020/184
Roll Callhttps://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2020/187
Roll Callhttps://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2020/188
Roll Callhttps://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2020/189
Roll Callhttps://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2020/194
Roll Callhttps://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2020/195
Roll Callhttps://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2020/196
Roll Callhttps://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2020/197

Bill Comments

feedback