VT S0342 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor July 13, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to temporary workers’ compensation amendments related to COVID-19

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to temporary workers’ compensation amendments related to COVID-19

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-26HouseSenate Message, Signed by Governor July 13, 2020
2020-07-13SenateSigned by Governor on July 13, 2020
2020-07-07SenateDelivered to Governor on July 7, 2020
2020-06-26HouseSenate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in
2020-06-26SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2020-06-26SenateRules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2020-06-26SenateHouse proposal of amendment concurred in
2020-06-26SenateHouse proposal of amendment; text
2020-06-26SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe
2020-06-26SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2020-06-26HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2020-06-26HouseRead Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
2020-06-26HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Kimbell of Woodstock, Bancroft of Westford, Carroll of Bennington, Dickinson of St. Albans Town, Jerome of Brandon, Marcotte of Coventry, Morris of Springfield, O'Sullivan of Burlington, Ralph of Hartland, and Toleno of Brattleboro agreed to
2020-06-26HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Browning of Arlington and Donahue of Northfield disagreed to
2020-06-26HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Cordes of Lincoln agreed to
2020-06-26HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Marcotte of Coventry, Bancroft of Westford, Dickinson of St. Albans Town, Jerome of Brandon, Kimbell of Woodstock, Morris of Springfield, O'Sullivan of Burlington, Ralph of Hartland, and Toleno of Brattleboro agreed to
2020-06-26HouseRules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2020-06-26HouseThird Reading Ordered
2020-06-26HouseReport of Committee on Commerce and Economic Development as amended agreed to
2020-06-26HouseRep. O'Sullivan of Burlington reported for the committee on Commerce and Economic Development
2020-06-26HouseRead Second Time
2020-06-26HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2020-04-29HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development
2020-04-27SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2020-04-27SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2020-04-27SenateRules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Ashe
2020-04-27Senate3rd reading ordered
2020-04-27SenateRead 2nd time
2020-04-27SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe
2020-04-27SenateCommittee Bill for Second Reading
2020-04-24SenateCommittee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback