VT S0335 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - As passed by Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to universal access to afterschool programs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to universal access to afterschool programs

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-14SenateAs passed by Senate
2020-02-14SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2020-02-14SenateRoll Call, requested by Senator Rodgers,  Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 16, Nays = 13
2020-02-14SenateMotion agreed to
2020-02-14SenatePending third reading, motion to amend bill offered by Senator(s) White, Sears, and Clarkson
2020-02-14SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2020-02-13Senate3rd reading ordered
2020-02-13SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations agreed to
2020-02-13SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator McCormack for Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-13SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-13SenateUnfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading
2020-02-12SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-12SenateUnfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading
2020-02-11SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-11SenateNew Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading
2020-02-07SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-07SenateCommittee Bill for Second Reading
2020-02-07SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-01-29SenateReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
2020-01-29SenateCommittee Bill for Second Reading
2020-01-29SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-01-28SenateCommittee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback