VT S0324 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development
Pending: House Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development
Pending: House Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to prohibiting robocalls
Title
An act relating to prohibiting robocalls
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Collamore, Passed -- Needed 14 of 27 to Pass -- Yeas = 27, Nays = 0 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Collamore, Passed -- Needed 14 of 27 to Pass -- Yeas = 27, Nays = 0 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2020-02-20 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2020-02-20 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |