VT S0316 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Referred to the Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to execution of wills during an emergency

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to execution of wills during an emergency

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Judiciary
2020-03-24SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2020-03-24SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2020-03-24SenateRules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Ashe
2020-03-24Senate3rd reading ordered
2020-03-24SenateRecommendation of amendment agreed to
2020-03-24SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary
2020-03-24SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2020-03-24SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2020-03-13SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2020-03-13SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-01-17SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback