VT S0289 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Signed by Governor on May 22, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to protecting consumers and promoting an open Internet in Vermont.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to protecting consumers and promoting an open Internet in Vermont.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-22SenateSigned by Governor on May 22, 2018
2018-05-16SenateDelivered to Governor on May 16, 2018
2018-05-12SenateRules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint
2018-05-12HouseSenate message, report of committee of conference adopted
2018-05-12SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2018-05-12SenateCommittee of Conference report adopted
2018-05-12SenateCommittee of Conference report submitted by Senator Lyons for Committee, text
2018-05-12SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe
2018-05-12SenateHouse message House adopted Conference Committee report
2018-05-12SenateCommittee of Conference Report
2018-05-12SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-05-11HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
2018-05-11HouseCommittee of Conference report adopted (Senate bill)
2018-05-11HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
2018-05-01SenateHouse message House appointed Conference Committee members
2018-04-27HouseSpeaker appointed Carr of Brandon, Chesnut-Tangerman of Middletown Springs and Sibilia of Dover as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House
2018-04-25SenateCommittee of Conference appointed: Senators Lyons, Campion, and Sirotkin
2018-04-25SenateHouse proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator Sirotkin
2018-04-25SenateHouse proposal of amendment; text
2018-04-25SenateNew Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2018-04-24SenateHouse Proposal of Amendment
2018-04-24SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-04-20SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2018-04-19HousePassed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2018-04-19HouseRead Third time
2018-04-19HouseRep. Kimbell of Woodstock asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment
2018-04-19HouseRep. Kimbell of Woodstock, Conquest of Newbury, and Sibilia of Dover moved to amend the bill
2018-04-18HouseThird Reading Ordered
2018-04-18HouseReport of Committee on Energy and Technology agreed to.
2018-04-18HouseRep. Kimbell of Woodstock asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment
2018-04-18HouseRep. Kimbell of Woodstock, Conquest of Newbury, and Sibilia of Dover moved to amend the report of the committee on Energy and Technology
2018-04-18HouseRep. Sibilia of Dover reported for the committee on Energy and Technology
2018-04-18HouseRead Second Time
2018-02-07HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Energy and Technology
2018-02-02SenateSenator Brock explained vote
2018-02-02SenateSenator Benning explained vote
2018-02-02SenateRead 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Sirotkin, Passed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 23, Nays = 5
2018-02-02SenateRecommendation of amendment disagreed to
2018-02-02SenateRecommendation of amendment by Senator(s) Brock, text
2018-02-02SenatePending third reading, Senator(s) Brock moved to amend bill
2018-02-02SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2018-02-01SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2018-01-31Senate3rd reading ordered
2018-01-31SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance, as amended, agreed to
2018-01-31SenateSenator Flory moved to postpone action for two legislative days, which was not agreed to.
2018-01-31SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance amended as moved by Senator Brock
2018-01-31SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Sirotkin for Committee on Finance
2018-01-31SenateRecommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Brock
2018-01-31SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
2018-01-31SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2018-01-30SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onFinance
2018-01-30SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-01-03SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback