VT S0287 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Pending question:  Shall bill be read third time?
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to the contractual rights of members of the Vermont State Employees’ Retirement System

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to the contractual rights of members of the Vermont State Employees’ Retirement System

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-27SenatePending question:  Shall bill be read third time?
2020-05-27SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-05-26SenatePending question:  Shall bill be read third time?
2020-05-26SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-05-22SenatePending question:  Shall bill be read third time?
2020-05-22SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-05-21SenatePending question:  Shall bill be read third time?
2020-05-21SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-05-20SenatePending Question: Shall the bill be read the third time?
2020-05-20SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-05-19SenatePending Question: Shall the bill be read the third time?
2020-05-19SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-05-14SenatePending Question: Shall the bill be read the third time?
2020-05-14SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-05-12SenatePending Question: Shall the bill be read the third time?
2020-05-12SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-05-07SenatePending Question: Shall the bill be read the third time?
2020-05-07SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-05-05SenatePending Question: Shalll the bill be read the third time?
2020-05-05SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-05-04SenatePending Question: Shall the bill be read the third time?
2020-05-04SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-05-01SenatePending Question: Shall the bill be read the third time?
2020-05-01SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-04-29SenatePending Question: Shall the bill be read the third time?
2020-04-29SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-04-27SenatePending Question: Shall the bill be read the third time?
2020-04-27SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-04-24SenatePending Question: Shall the bill be read the third time?
2020-04-24SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-04-23SenatePending Question: Shall the bill be read the third time?
2020-04-23SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-04-22SenatePending Question: Shall the bill be read the third time?
2020-04-22SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-04-20SenatePending Question: Shall the bill be read the third time?
2020-04-20SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-04-17SenatePending Question: Shall the bill be read the third time?
2020-04-17SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-04-16SenatePending Question: Shall the bill be read the third time?
2020-04-16SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-04-14SenatePending Question: Shall the bill be read the third time?
2020-04-14SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-04-11SenatePending Question: Shall the bill be read the third time?
2020-04-11SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-04-10SenatePending Question: Shall the bill be read the third time?
2020-04-10SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-04-09SenatePending Question: Shall the bill be read the third time?
2020-04-09SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-04-08SenatePending Question: Shall the bill be read the third time?
2020-04-08SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-04-07SenatePending Question: Shall the bill be read the third time?
2020-04-07SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-04-06SenatePending Question: Shall the bill be read the third time?
2020-04-06SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-04-03SenatePending Question: Shall the bill be read the third time?
2020-04-03SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-04-01SenatePending Question: Shall the bill be read the third time?
2020-04-01SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-03-30SenatePending Question: Shall the bill be read the third time?
2020-03-30SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-03-27SenatePending Question: Shall the bill be read the third time?
2020-03-27SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-03-24SenatePending Question: Shall the bill be read the third time?
2020-03-24SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-03-13SenatePending Question: Shall the bill be read the 3rd time?
2020-03-13SenateSecond Reading
2020-03-13SenateConsideration postponed to March 17, 2020
2020-03-12SenatePending question:  Shall bill be read third time?
2020-03-12SenateConsideration Postponed/Second Reading
2020-03-11SenateConsideration postponed to next legislative day on motion of Senator Kitchel
2020-03-11SenateReported favorably by Senator Pollina for Committee on Government Operations
2020-03-11SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-11SenateFavorable report by Committee on Government Operations
2020-03-11SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2020-03-10SenateFavorable report by Committee on Government Operations
2020-03-10SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-01-14SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback