VT S0284 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-22 - Read first time and referred to the Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-22 - Read first time and referred to the Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to student use of cell phones and other personal electronic devices in schools
Title
An act relating to student use of cell phones and other personal electronic devices in schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-22 | House | Read first time and referred to the Committee on Education |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Title amended as recommended by Committee on Education |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Motion to amend bill agreed to |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senator Kitchel moved to amend motion to amend offered by Senator Watson, Campion, Chittenden, Gulick, Hashim, Vyhovsky, Weeks, and Williams, which was agreed to |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend bill offered by Senator(s) Watson, Campion, Chittenden, Gulick, Hashim, Vyhovsky, Weeks, and Williams |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Watson |
2024-03-20 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2024-03-19 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education agreed to |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Williams for Committee on Education |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2024-03-19 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Education |