VT S0283 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Senate Message, signed by Governor June 1, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Senate Message, signed by Governor June 1, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to miscellaneous changes to education laws
Title
An act relating to miscellaneous changes to education laws
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | Senate Message, signed by Governor June 1, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor on June 1, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on May 26, 2022 |
2022-05-11 | House | Senate Message, report of Committee of Conference adopted |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint |
2022-05-11 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Committee of Conference report adopted |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Chittenden for Committee, text |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Balint |
2022-05-11 | Senate | House message: House adopted Conference Committee report |
2022-05-11 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2022-05-11 | House | Committee of Conference report adopted (Senate bill) |
2022-05-11 | House | Rules suspended and taken up for immediate consideration as moved by Rep. LaClair of Barre Town |
2022-05-11 | House | Notice Calendar: Report of Committee of Conference |
2022-05-09 | Senate | House message: House appointed Conference Committee members |
2022-05-09 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2022-05-09 | House | Speaker appointed Webb of Shelburne, Conlon of Cornwall and Cupoli of Rutland City as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2022-05-07 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment not concurred in and Committee of Conference appointed |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Campion, Chittenden, and Hooker |
2022-05-06 | Senate | House proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator Campion |
2022-05-06 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Balint, Chittenden, Campion, Hooker, Lyons, Perchlik, and Terenzini |
2022-05-06 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2022-05-05 | Senate | House message: House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2022-05-05 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-05-04 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2022-05-04 | House | Read Third time and passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2022-05-04 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2022-05-03 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2022-05-03 | House | Report of Committee on Education agreed to |
2022-05-03 | House | Rep. Scheu of Middlebury recommended for the Committee on Appropriations |
2022-05-03 | House | Rep. Conlon of Cornwall reported for the Committee on Education |
2022-05-03 | House | Read Second time |
2022-05-03 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-05-02 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-04-29 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-04-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2022-03-16 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Education |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2022-03-11 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2022-03-10 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment agreed to |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Chittenden for Committee on Education |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2022-03-09 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Committed to Committee on Education on motion of Senator Campion |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campion |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Committee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48 |