VT S0283 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-16 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 15, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-16 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 15, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the Town of Hartford’s tax increment financing district
Title
An act relating to the Town of Hartford’s tax increment financing district
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | House | Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 15, 2020 |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor on June 15, 2020 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on June 9, 2020 |
2020-06-02 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2020-06-02 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence |
2020-05-29 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2020-05-29 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence |
2020-05-27 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2020-05-27 | House | Rep. Anthony of Barre City reported for the committee on Ways and Means |
2020-05-27 | House | Read Second Time |
2020-02-27 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2020-02-25 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Brock for Committee on Finance, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2020-02-21 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance |