VT S0276 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Signed by Governor on May 30, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to rural economic development

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to rural economic development

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-30SenateSigned by Governor on May 30, 2018
2018-05-24SenateDelivered to Governor on May 24, 2018
2018-05-11HouseSenate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in
2018-05-11SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2018-05-11SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2018-05-11SenateHouse proposal of amendment concurred in
2018-05-11SenateHouse proposal of amendment; text
2018-05-11SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe
2018-05-10SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2018-05-09HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
2018-05-09HouseRead Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
2018-05-09HouseRules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
2018-05-09HouseThird Reading Ordered
2018-05-09HouseReport of Committee on Agriculture and Forestry as amended agreed to
2018-05-09HouseRep. Partridge of Windham moved to amend the report of the committee on Agriculture and Forestry, which was agreed to.
2018-05-09HouseRep. Bartholomew of Hartland moved to amend the report of the committee on Agriculture and Forestry, which was agreed to.
2018-05-09HouseRep. Sibilia of Dover asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment
2018-05-09HouseRep. Sibilia of Dover, Conquest of Newbury, Gannon of Wilmington, Jickling of Randolph, Keefe of Manchester, Kimbell of Woodstock, Pajala of Londonderry, and Young of Glover moved to amend the report of the committee on Agriculture and Forestry
2018-05-09HouseReport of the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry amended as recommended by the Committee on Appropriations
2018-05-09HouseRep. Feltus of Lyndon recommended for the committee on Appropriations
2018-05-09HouseReport of the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry amended as recommended by the Committee on Ways and Means
2018-05-09HouseRep. Browning of Arlington recommended for the committee on Ways and Means
2018-05-09HouseRep. Partridge of Windham reported for the committee on Agriculture and Forestry
2018-05-09HouseRead Second Time
2018-05-09HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
2018-05-07HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
2018-04-27HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
2018-03-28HouseRep. Hill of Wolcott moved that the committee on Commerce and Economic Development be relieved of the bill and that the same be committed to the committee on Agriculture and Forestry which was agreed to.
2018-03-27HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development
2018-03-22SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2018-03-22SenatePending third reading, bill amended as moved by Senator(s) Bray
2018-03-22SenatePending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Bray
2018-03-22SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2018-03-21Senate3rd reading ordered
2018-03-21SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture, as amended, agreed to
2018-03-21SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations
2018-03-21SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture amended as recommended by Committee on Finance
2018-03-21SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture amended as recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2018-03-21SenateReported favorably by Senator Starr for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment
2018-03-21SenateReported favorably by Senator Cummings for Committee on Finance with recommendation of amendment
2018-03-21SenateReported favorably by Senator Bray for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy with recommendation of amendment
2018-03-21SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Pollina for Committee on Agriculture
2018-03-21SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2018-03-21SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
2018-03-21SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2018-03-21SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture
2018-03-21SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2018-03-20SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onAppropriations
2018-03-20SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onFinance
2018-03-20SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onNatural Resources and Energy
2018-03-20SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onAgriculture
2018-03-20SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-03-15SenateRules suspended & bill committed to Committee on Appropriations with the report of Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources & Finance intact, on motion of Senator Cummings
2018-03-13SenateReferred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31
2018-03-13SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onNatural Resources and Energy
2018-03-13SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onAgriculture
2018-03-13SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-02-22SenateRules suspended & bill committed to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy with the report of Committee on Agriculture intact, on motion of Senator Bray
2018-02-22SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onAgriculture
2018-02-22SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-01-05SenateCommittee on Natural Resources and Energy relieved; bill committed to Committee on Agriculture on motion of Senator Campion
2018-01-03SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback