VT S0273 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 8 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-12 - House message House adopted Conference Committee report
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to miscellaneous law enforcement amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to miscellaneous law enforcement amendments

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-12SenateHouse message House adopted Conference Committee report
2018-05-12SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2018-05-12HouseSenate message, report of committee of conference adopted
2018-05-12SenateRules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2018-05-12SenateCommittee of Conference report adopted
2018-05-12SenateCommittee of Conference report submitted by Senator White for Committee, text
2018-05-12SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe
2018-05-12SenateCommittee of Conference Report
2018-05-12SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-05-11HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
2018-05-11HouseCommittee of Conference report adopted (Senate bill)
2018-05-11HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
2018-05-10SenateHouse message House appointed Conference Committee members
2018-05-09HouseSpeaker appointed Brumsted of Shelburne, Harrison of Chittenden and LaClair of Barre Town as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House
2018-05-08HouseSenate Message, House proposal of amendment not concurred in and committee of conference appointed
2018-05-08SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2018-05-08SenateCommittee of Conference appointed: Senators White, Collamore, and Clarkson
2018-05-08SenateHouse proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator White
2018-05-08SenateHouse proposal of amendment; text
2018-05-08SenateUnfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2018-05-07SenateNew Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2018-05-05SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2018-05-05SenateHouse Proposal of Amendment
2018-05-05SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-05-04HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
2018-05-04HouseRead Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
2018-05-03HouseThird Reading Ordered
2018-05-03HouseReport of Committee on Government Operations as amended agreed to
2018-05-03HouseReport of the Committee on Government Operations amended as recommended by the Committee on Appropriations
2018-05-03HouseRep. Fagan of Rutland City recommended for the committee on Appropriations
2018-05-03HouseRep. Harrison of Chittenden reported for the committee on Government Operations
2018-05-03HouseRead Second Time
2018-05-03HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
2018-04-27HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
2018-03-23HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations
2018-03-21SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2018-03-21SenateRecommendation of amendment agreed to
2018-03-21SenatePending third reading, Senator(s) Sears moved to amend bill
2018-03-21SenatePending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Sears
2018-03-21SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2018-03-20Senate3rd reading ordered
2018-03-20SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations, as amended, agreed to
2018-03-20SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations
2018-03-20SenateReported favorably by Senator Sears for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment
2018-03-20SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator White for Committee on Government Operations
2018-03-20SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2018-03-20SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
2018-03-20SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2018-03-16SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onAppropriations
2018-03-16SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onGovernment Operations
2018-03-16SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-03-13SenateReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
2018-03-13SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onGovernment Operations
2018-03-13SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-01-03SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback