VT S0244 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Signed by Governor on May 30, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to extending the repeal date for the guidelines for spousal maintenance awards

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to extending the repeal date for the guidelines for spousal maintenance awards

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-30SenateSigned by Governor on May 30, 2018
2018-05-24SenateDelivered to Governor on May 24, 2018
2018-05-11SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2018-05-11HouseSenate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in
2018-05-11SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2018-05-11SenateHouse proposal of amendment concurred in
2018-05-11SenateHouse proposal of amendment; text
2018-05-11SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe
2018-05-10SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2018-05-09HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
2018-05-09HouseRead Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
2018-05-09HouseRules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
2018-05-09HouseThird Reading Ordered
2018-05-09HouseReport of Committee on Judiciary agreed to.
2018-05-09HouseRep. Jessup of Middlesex reported for the committee on Judiciary
2018-05-09HouseRead Second Time
2018-05-09HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
2018-02-16HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary
2018-02-14SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2018-02-14SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2018-02-13Senate3rd reading ordered
2018-02-13SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to
2018-02-13SenateReported favorably by Senator Nitka for Committee on Appropriations
2018-02-13SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator White for Committee on Judiciary
2018-02-13SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2018-02-13SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2018-02-13SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2018-02-09SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2018-02-09SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary
2018-02-09SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-01-25SenateReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
2018-01-25SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary
2018-01-25SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-01-03SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback