VT S0241 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Signed by Governor on May 30, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to the makeup and duties of the Emergency Medical Services Advisory Committee

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to the makeup and duties of the Emergency Medical Services Advisory Committee

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-30SenateSigned by Governor on May 30, 2018
2018-05-24SenateDelivered to Governor on May 24, 2018
2018-05-12SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2018-05-12SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence
2018-05-11HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
2018-05-11HouseRead Third time and Passed in Concurrence
2018-05-11HouseRules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
2018-05-11HouseThird Reading Ordered
2018-05-11HouseRep. Townsend of South Burlington reported for the committee on Government Operations
2018-05-11HouseRead Second Time
2018-05-11HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
2018-04-26HouseRep. Lippert of Hinesburg moved that the committee on Health Care be relieved of the bill and that the same be committed to the committee on Government Operations which was agreed to.
2018-03-15HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Health Care
2018-03-13SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2018-03-13SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2018-03-02Senate3rd reading ordered
2018-03-02SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to
2018-03-02SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator White for Committee on Government Operations
2018-03-02SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
2018-03-02SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2018-03-01SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
2018-03-01SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2018-02-28SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
2018-02-28SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2018-02-27SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onGovernment Operations
2018-02-27SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-01-04SenateCommittee on Health and Welfare relieved; bill committed to Committee on Government Operations on motion of Senator Ayer
2018-01-03SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback