VT S0240 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Signed by Governor on March 18, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to recruiting new remote workers and new relocating workers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to recruiting new remote workers and new relocating workers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18SenateSigned by Governor on March 18, 2020
2020-03-18SenateSigned by Governor on March 18, 2020
2020-03-12SenateDelivered to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-12HouseSenate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in
2020-03-11SenateRules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Sirotkin
2020-03-11SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2020-03-11SenateHouse proposal of amendment concurred in
2020-03-11SenateHouse proposal of amendment; text
2020-03-11SenateNew Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2020-03-10SenateHouse Proposal of Amendment
2020-03-10SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-02-28SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2020-02-26HouseRead Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
2020-02-25HouseThird Reading Ordered
2020-02-25HouseProposal of amendment of the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development agreed to
2020-02-25HouseRep. Myers of Essex recommended for the committee on Appropriations
2020-02-25HouseRep. O'Sullivan of Burlington reported for the committee on Commerce and Economic Development
2020-02-25HouseRead Second Time
2020-02-21HouseRep. O'Sullivan of Burlington moved to postpone action until February 25, 2020 which was agreed to
2020-02-12HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
2020-01-28HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development
2020-01-23SenateAs passed by Senate
2020-01-23SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2020-01-23SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2020-01-22Senate3rd reading ordered
2020-01-22SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs agreed to
2020-01-22SenateReported favorably by Senator Kitchel for Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-22SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Sirotkin for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2020-01-22SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-22SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2020-01-22SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-01-21SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-21SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2020-01-17SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-17SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2020-01-17SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-01-15SenateReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
2020-01-15SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2020-01-15SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-01-07SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback