VT S0237 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 18 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to providing representation to needy persons concerning immigration matters

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to providing representation to needy persons concerning immigration matters

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-19HouseSenate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in
2018-04-18SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2018-04-18SenateHouse proposal of amendment concurred in
2018-04-18SenateHouse proposal of amendment; text
2018-04-18SenateUnfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2018-04-13SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2018-04-17SenateNew Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2018-04-13SenateHouse Proposal of Amendment
2018-04-13SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-04-11HousePassed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2018-04-11HouseRead Third time
2018-04-11HouseWhich was agreed to
2018-04-11HouseRep. Donahue of Northfield, Willhoit of St. Johnsbury, and Kimbell of Woodstock moved to amend the bill
2018-04-10HouseThird Reading Ordered
2018-04-10HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 137 to Pass -- Yeas = 97, Nays = 40
2018-04-10HouseRep. Colburn of Burlington reported for the committee on Judiciary
2018-04-10HouseRead Second Time
2018-02-20HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary
2018-02-15SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2018-02-15SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2018-02-14Senate3rd reading ordered
2018-02-14SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to on roll call, requested by Senator Brock, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 28, Nays = 2
2018-02-14SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary
2018-02-14SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2018-02-14SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2018-02-13SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary
2018-02-13SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-01-03SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback