VT S0229 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to State Board of Education approval of independent schools

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to State Board of Education approval of independent schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-16HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Education
2018-03-14SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2018-03-14SenateSenator Campion requested & granted leave to withdraw amendment
2018-03-14SenatePending third reading, Senator(s) Campion and Sears moved to amend bill
2018-03-14SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2018-03-13Senate3rd reading ordered
2018-03-13SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Education agreed to
2018-03-13SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Baruth for Committee on Education
2018-03-13SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education
2018-03-13SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2018-03-02SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education
2018-03-02SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2018-03-01SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onEducation
2018-03-01SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-01-03SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Education

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback