VT S0229 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-16 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-16 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to State Board of Education approval of independent schools
Title
An act relating to State Board of Education approval of independent schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Education |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senator Campion requested & granted leave to withdraw amendment |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Campion and Sears moved to amend bill |
2018-03-14 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-03-13 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education agreed to |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Baruth for Committee on Education |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2018-03-02 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onEducation |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Education |