VT S0226 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-20 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs
Pending: House General, Housing and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-20 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs
Pending: House General, Housing and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to statewide public school employee health benefits
Title
An act relating to statewide public school employee health benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-20 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2020-05-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2020-05-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2020-04-29 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2020-04-27 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2020-04-24 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2020-04-20 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2020-04-17 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2020-04-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2020-04-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2020-04-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2020-04-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2020-04-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2020-04-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2020-04-06 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2020-04-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2020-04-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2020-03-30 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2020-03-27 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2020-03-24 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2020-03-13 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education, as amended, agreed to |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Motion agreed to |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senator(s) Baruth motion to amend recommendation of amendment; text |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator McCormack for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Perchlik for Committee on Education |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2020-03-13 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Education |