VT S0225 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - Signed by Governor on May 21, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - Signed by Governor on May 21, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to pilot programs for coverage by commercial health insurers of costs associated with medication-assisted treatment
Title
An act relating to pilot programs for coverage by commercial health insurers of costs associated with medication-assisted treatment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor on May 21, 2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on May 15,2018 |
2018-04-27 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2018-04-27 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence |
2018-04-25 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence |
2018-04-24 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-04-24 | House | Rep. Cina of Burlington reported for the committee on Health Care |
2018-04-24 | House | Rep. Pugh of South Burlington reported for the committee on Human Services |
2018-04-24 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-04-13 | House | Rep. Pugh of South Burlington moved that the bill be committed to the committee on Health Care which was agreed to. |
2018-04-13 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Pugh of South Burlington |
2018-03-20 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Human Services |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2018-03-15 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-03-14 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Lyons for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2018-03-14 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onHealth and Welfare |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |