VT S0216 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 2 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to the administration of Vermont’s Medical Marijuana Registry

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to the administration of Vermont’s Medical Marijuana Registry

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-02SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2018-03-13HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Human Services
2018-03-02SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2018-03-02SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2018-03-01Senate3rd reading ordered
2018-03-01SenateRecommendation of amendment disagreed to
2018-03-01SenateRecommendation of amendment by Senator(s) Ingram, Cummings, and Lyons, text
2018-03-01SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary, as amended, agreed to
2018-03-01SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary amended as moved by Senator White and Sears
2018-03-01SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator White for Committee on Judiciary
2018-03-01SenateRecommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Ingram, Cummings, and Lyons
2018-03-01SenateRecommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) White and Sears
2018-03-01SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2018-03-01SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2018-02-28SenateRecommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Ingram, Cummings, and Lyons
2018-02-28SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2018-02-28SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2018-02-27SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary
2018-02-27SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-01-05SenateCommittee on Health and Welfare relieved; bill committed to Committee on Judiciary on motion of Senator Ayer
2018-01-03SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback