VT S0207 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-30 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development
Pending: House Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to eliminating fees for placing or removing a credit freeze

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to eliminating fees for placing or removing a credit freeze

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-30HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development
2018-01-25SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2018-01-25SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2018-01-24Senate3rd reading ordered
2018-01-24SenateRecommendation of amendment agreed to
2018-01-24SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Soucy for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2018-01-23SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onEconomic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2018-01-23SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-01-03SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback