VT S0192 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 7 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 7 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to transferring the professional regulation of law enforcement officers from the Vermont Criminal Justice Training Council to the Office of Professional Regulation
Title
An act relating to transferring the professional regulation of law enforcement officers from the Vermont Criminal Justice Training Council to the Office of Professional Regulation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Pearson, Collamore, and Ayer |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Pearson, Collamore, and White |
2018-05-08 | Senate | House message House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed |
2018-05-08 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2018-05-08 | House | Speaker appointed LaClair of Barre Town, Gardner of Richmond and Lewis of Berlin as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2018-05-08 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment not concurred in and Committee of Conference requested upon motion of Rep. LaClair of Barre Town |
2018-05-08 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton |
2018-05-07 | House | Senate message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senator Pearson moved to concur in House proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment; text |
2018-05-07 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-05-04 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-05-03 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2018-05-03 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-05-02 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton |
2018-05-02 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2018-05-01 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-05-01 | House | Report of Committee on Government Operations as amended agreed to |
2018-05-01 | House | Report of the Committee on Government Operations amended as recommended by the Committee on Appropriations |
2018-05-01 | House | Rep. Juskiewicz of Cambridge recommended for the committee on Appropriations |
2018-05-01 | House | Rep. LaClair of Barre Town reported for the committee on Government Operations |
2018-05-01 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2018-03-23 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2018-03-21 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-03-20 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator McCormack for Committee on Appropriations |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Cummings for Committee on Finance |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Pearson for Committee on Government Operations |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2018-03-20 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onGovernment Operations |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onFinance |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onGovernment Operations |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onGovernment Operations |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |