VT S0182 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor mAY 3, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to the investment authority of municipal trustees of public funds

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to the investment authority of municipal trustees of public funds

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-04HouseSenate Message, Signed by Governor mAY 3, 2018
2018-05-03SenateSigned by Governor on May 3, 2018
2018-04-27SenateDelivered to Governor on April 27, 2018
2018-04-19HouseSenate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in
2018-04-18SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2018-04-18SenateHouse proposal of amendment concurred in
2018-04-18SenateHouse proposal of amendment; text
2018-04-18SenateUnfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2018-04-13SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2018-04-17SenateNew Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2018-04-13SenateHouse Proposal of Amendment
2018-04-13SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-04-11HouseRead Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
2018-04-11HouseWhich was agreed to
2018-04-11HouseRep. Fagan of Rutland City moved to amend the bill
2018-04-10HouseThird Reading Ordered
2018-04-10HouseReport of Committee on Government Operations agreed to.
2018-04-10HouseRep. Gannon of Wilmington reported for the committee on Government Operations
2018-04-10HouseRead Second Time
2018-02-09HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations
2018-02-07SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2018-02-07SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2018-02-06Senate3rd reading ordered
2018-02-06SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to
2018-02-06SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Clarkson for Committee on Government Operations
2018-02-06SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
2018-02-06SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2018-02-02SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onGovernment Operations
2018-02-02SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-01-03SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback