VT S0175 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Signed by Governor on May 16, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Signed by Governor on May 16, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the wholesale importation of prescription drugs into Vermont
Title
An act relating to the wholesale importation of prescription drugs into Vermont
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Ashe [D] | Sen. Claire Ayer [D] | Sen. Virginia Lyons [D] | Sen. Christopher Pearson [D] |
Sen. Michael Sirotkin [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-07 - Senate - House proposal of amendment concurred in on roll call requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 29, Nays = 0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 143 to Pass -- Yeas = 141, Nays = 2 (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 143 to Pass -- Yeas = 141, Nays = 2 (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | Senate | Signed by Governor on May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-07 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2018-05-07 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in on roll call requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 29, Nays = 0 |
2018-05-07 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2018-05-07 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-05-05 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-05-04 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2018-05-03 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton |
2018-05-03 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2018-05-02 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-05-02 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 143 to Pass -- Yeas = 141, Nays = 2 |
2018-05-02 | House | Report of Committee on Health Care as amended agreed to |
2018-05-02 | House | Report of the Committee on Health Care amended as recommended by the Committee on Ways and Means |
2018-05-02 | House | Rep. Yacovone of Morristown recommended for the committee on Appropriations |
2018-05-02 | House | Rep. Till of Jericho recommended for the committee on Ways and Means |
2018-05-02 | House | Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg reported for the committee on Health Care |
2018-05-02 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-05-01 | House | Action Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg |
2018-04-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2018-04-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2018-03-13 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Health Care |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-02-28 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare, as amended, agreed to |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Ashe for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Lyons for Committee on Finance |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Ayer for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2018-02-28 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onAppropriations |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onHealth and Welfare |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onHealth and Welfare |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onHealth and Welfare |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |