VT S0168 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs
Pending: House General, Housing and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to employment protection for volunteer emergency responders

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to employment protection for volunteer emergency responders

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-20HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs
2018-03-15SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2018-03-15SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2018-03-14Senate3rd reading ordered
2018-03-14SenateRecommendation of Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs, as amended, agreed to
2018-03-14SenateMotion agreed to
2018-03-14SenateSenator(s) Soucy motion to substitute amendment for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs recommendation of amendment; text
2018-03-14SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Soucy for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2018-03-14SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2018-03-14SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2018-03-13SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onEconomic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2018-03-13SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-01-03SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback