VT S0162 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 19, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 19, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to promoting economic development
Title
An act relating to promoting economic development
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-12 - Senate - 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 27, Nays = 2 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | House | Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 19, 2019 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor on June 19, 2019 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on June 17, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment |
2019-05-24 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. LaClair of Barre Town |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2019-05-24 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in with proposal of amendment, on motion of Senator Brock, Sirotkin, and Bray |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senator Brock, Sirotkin, and Bray moved to concur in House proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment; text |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-21 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-20 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-05-17 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2019-05-17 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-17 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-17 | House | Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-17 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-05-17 | House | Report of Committee on Commerce and Economic Development as amended agreed to |
2019-05-17 | House | Which was agreed to |
2019-05-17 | House | Rep. Young of Greensboro, Ancel of Calais, Anthony of Barre City, Beck of St. Johnsbury, Birong of Vergennes, Brennan of Colchester, Browning of Arlington, Canfield of Fair Haven, Colburn of Burlington, Fegard of Berkshire, Harrison of Chittenden, Hill of Wolcott, LaClair of Barre Town, Noyes of Wolcott, O'Brien of Tunbridge, Pajala of Londonderry, Scheu of Middlebury, Strong of Albany, and Sullivan of Dorset moved to amend the report of the committee on Commerce and Economic Development |
2019-05-17 | House | Report of the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development amended as recommended by the Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-05-17 | House | Report of the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development amended as recommended by the Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-17 | House | Rep. Scheu of Middlebury recommended for the committee on Ways and Means |
2019-05-17 | House | Rep. Myers of Essex recommended for the committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-17 | House | Rep. O'Sullivan of Burlington recommended for the committee on Commerce and Economic Development |
2019-05-17 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2019-05-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2019-04-18 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Pending third reading, bill amended as moved by Senator(s) Brock |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Brock |
2019-04-16 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 27, Nays = 2 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance agreed to |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Brock for Committee on Finance with recommendation of amendment |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Senator McCormack requested & granted leave to withdraw Appropriations Committee recommendation of amendment |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator McCormack for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-04-12 | Senate | New Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Brock |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Committee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48 |