VT S0155 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the creation of the Agency of Public Safety
Title
An act relating to the creation of the Agency of Public Safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Government Operations |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2022-03-24 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Kitchel for Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator White for Committee on Government Operations |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2022-03-17 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |