VT S0153 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - New Business/Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to creating the Vermont 250th Commission

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to creating the Vermont 250th Commission

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-18SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2020-02-14Senate3rd reading ordered
2020-02-14SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations, as amended, agreed to
2020-02-14SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-14SenateReported favorably by Senator Kitchel for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment
2020-02-14SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Pollina for Committee on Government Operations
2020-02-14SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-14SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
2020-02-14SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2020-02-13SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-13SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
2020-02-13SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
2020-02-05SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
2020-02-05SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-03-13SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback