VT S0150 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Signed by Governor on May 25, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to automated license plate recognition systems

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to automated license plate recognition systems

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25SenateSigned by Governor on May 25, 2018
2018-05-21SenateDelivered to Governor on May 21, 2018
2018-05-10SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2018-05-10SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence
2018-05-09HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
2018-05-09HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
2018-05-09HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment considered
2018-05-09HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
2018-05-08HouseSenate message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto
2018-05-08SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2018-05-08SenateHouse proposal of amendment concurred in with proposal of amendment, on motion of Senator Nitka, Ashe, Benning, Sears, and White
2018-05-08SenateSenator Nitka, Ashe, Benning, Sears, and White moved to concur in House proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment; text
2018-05-08SenateHouse proposal of amendment; text
2018-05-08SenateUnfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2018-05-07SenateNew Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2018-05-05SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2018-05-05SenateHouse Proposal of Amendment
2018-05-05SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-05-04HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
2018-05-04HouseRead Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
2018-05-03HouseThird Reading Ordered
2018-05-03HouseReport of Committee on Judiciary agreed to.
2018-05-03HouseRep. Burditt of West Rutland reported for the committee on Judiciary
2018-05-03HouseRead Second Time
2018-05-03HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
2018-01-23HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary
2018-01-18SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2018-01-18SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2018-01-17SenateReported favorably by Senator Nitka for Committee on Judiciary, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered
2018-01-17SenateFavorable report by Committee on Judiciary
2018-01-17SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2018-01-16SenateFavorable report by Committee on Judiciary
2018-01-16SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-01-03SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback