VT S0142 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-07 - Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Human Services
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-07 - Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Human Services
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to designating August 31 as Overdose Awareness Day
Title
An act relating to designating August 31 as Overdose Awareness Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-07 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Human Services |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2021-05-05 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2021-05-04 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Ram for Committee on Government Operations |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Balint |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules per Temporary Senate Rule 44A |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |