VT S0141 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 24 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-07 - Rep. Pugh of South Burlington moved to commit bill to the committee on Human Services which was agreed to.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 24 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-07 - Rep. Pugh of South Burlington moved to commit bill to the committee on Human Services which was agreed to.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to nutritional requirements for children’s meals
Title
An act relating to nutritional requirements for children’s meals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-07 | House | Rep. Pugh of South Burlington moved to commit bill to the committee on Human Services which was agreed to. |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate message, adheres to its position |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Pearson |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Motion agreed to |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senator Pearson moved to not concur in House proposal of amendment and that the Senate ADHERE |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Pearson |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2019-05-24 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-24 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-24 | House | Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-24 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-05-24 | House | Which was agreed to |
2019-05-24 | House | Rep. Toll of Danville moved to amend the bill |
2019-05-24 | House | Rep. Pugh of South Burlington for the committee on Human Services reported without recommendation |
2019-05-24 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-05-24 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-03-27 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Human Services |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment agreed to |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend bill offered by Senator(s) Starr, Collamore, Hardy, Pearson, Pollina, and Parent |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Starr, Collamore, Hardy, Pearson, Pollina, and Parent |
2019-03-22 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-03-21 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Ingram for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-03-20 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |