VT S0133 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Signed by Governor on June 15, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Signed by Governor on June 15, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to examining mental health care and care coordination
Title
An act relating to examining mental health care and care coordination
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 68 of 134 to Pass -- Yeas = 134, Nays = 0 (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor on June 15, 2017 |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 6/15/17 |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on 6/9/17 |
2017-05-05 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2017-05-05 | Senate | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment |
2017-05-05 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2017-05-05 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment to the House Proposal of Amendment agreed to |
2017-05-05 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment considered |
2017-05-05 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2017-05-05 | House | Senate message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment agreed to |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Ayer; text |
2017-05-05 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Ayer |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2017-05-02 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2017-05-01 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2017-05-01 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2017-04-28 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2017-04-28 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2017-04-28 | House | Which was agreed to |
2017-04-28 | House | Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg moved to amend the House proposal of amendment. |
2017-04-27 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 68 of 134 to Pass -- Yeas = 134, Nays = 0 |
2017-04-27 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2017-04-27 | House | Report of Committee on Health Care agreed to. |
2017-04-27 | House | Rep. Hooper of Montpelier recommended for the committee on Appropriations |
2017-04-27 | House | Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg reported for the committee on Health Care |
2017-04-27 | House | Read Second Time |
2017-04-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2017-04-05 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Health Care |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2017-03-31 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2017-03-30 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations agreed to |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Kitchel for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2017-03-29 | Senate | New Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onAppropriations |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Committed to the Committee on Appropriations on motion of Senator Ashe |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Committee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48 |