VT S0130 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Committed to Committee on Education on motion of Senator Baruth
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to miscellaneous changes to education laws

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to miscellaneous changes to education laws

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28SenateCommitted to Committee on Education on motion of Senator Baruth
2017-04-28SenateHouse proposal of amendment; text
2017-04-28SenateNew Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2017-04-27SenateHouse Proposal of Amendment
2017-04-26SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2017-04-26HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
2017-04-26HouseRead Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
2017-04-26HouseWhich was agreed to
2017-04-26HouseRep. Beck of St. Johnsbury moved to amend the House proposal of amendment.
2017-04-26HouseWhich was agreed to
2017-04-26HouseRep. Cupoli of Rutland City moved to amend the House proposal of amendment.
2017-04-26HouseWhich was agreed to
2017-04-26HouseRep. Sibilia of Dover moved to amend the House proposal of amendment.
2017-04-25HouseThird Reading Ordered
2017-04-25HouseReport of Committee on Education as amended agreed to
2017-04-25HouseRep. Pugh of South Burlington moved to amend the House proposal of amendment which was agreed to
2017-04-25HouseReport of Committee on Appropriations agreed to.
2017-04-25HouseRep. Juskiewicz of Cambridge recommended for the committee on Appropriations
2017-04-25HouseRep. Conlon of Cornwall spoke for the committee on Education
2017-04-25HouseRead Second Time
2017-04-18HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
2017-04-05HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Education
2017-03-31SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2017-03-31SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2017-03-30Senate3rd reading ordered
2017-03-30SenateRecommendation of amendment disagreed to
2017-03-30SenateRecommendation of amendment by Senator(s) White, Ashe, Clarkson, and Pearson, text
2017-03-30SenateRecommendation of amendment agreed to
2017-03-30SenateRecommendation of amendment by Senator(s) Balint, Baruth, Benning, Bray, Ingram, and Mullin, text
2017-03-30SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations agreed to
2017-03-30SenateReported favorably by Senator McCormack for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment
2017-03-30SenateRead 2nd time
2017-03-30SenateRecommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) White, Ayer, Clarkson, and Pearson
2017-03-30SenateRecommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Balint, Baruth, Benning, Bray, Ingram, and Mullin
2017-03-30SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2017-03-30SenateUnfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading
2017-03-29SenateRecommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Balint, Baruth, Benning, Bray, Ingram, and Mullin
2017-03-29SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2017-03-29SenateNew Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading
2017-03-28SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2017-03-28SenateCommittee Bill for Second Reading
2017-03-21SenateReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
2017-03-21SenateCommittee Bill for Second Reading
2017-03-17SenateCommittee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback