VT S0125 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 26 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-05-29 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Health Care
Pending: House Health Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to Vermont’s adoption of the interstate Nurse Licensure Compact

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to Vermont’s adoption of the interstate Nurse Licensure Compact

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-29HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Health Care
2020-05-26SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2020-05-26SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2020-05-26SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2020-05-22Senate3rd reading ordered
2020-05-22SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to
2020-05-22SenateReported favorably by Senator Cummings for Committee on Finance
2020-05-22SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Lyons for Committee on Health and Welfare
2020-05-22SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe
2020-05-22SenateFavorable report by Committee on Finance
2020-05-22SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
2020-05-22SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-02-26SenateReferred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31
2020-02-26SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
2020-02-26SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-02-22SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback