VT S0123 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - Which was agreed to
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to limiting liability for animal shelter and rescue organizations assisting law enforcement in animal cruelty investigations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to limiting liability for animal shelter and rescue organizations assisting law enforcement in animal cruelty investigations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-07HouseWhich was agreed to
2018-05-07HouseRep. Lalonde of South Burlington moved to commit the bill to the committee on Commerce and Economic Development
2018-02-22HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary
2018-02-20SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2018-02-20SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2018-02-16Senate3rd reading ordered
2018-02-16SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to
2018-02-16SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary
2018-02-16SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2018-02-16SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2018-02-15SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary
2018-02-15SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2017-03-16SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback