VT S0120 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to postsecondary schools and sexual misconduct protections
Title
An act relating to postsecondary schools and sexual misconduct protections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2024-04-18 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable |
2024-03-29 | House | Read first time and referred to the Committee on Education |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2024-03-27 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2024-03-26 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education, as amended, agreed to |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Baruth for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Hashim for Committee on Education |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2024-03-21 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Education |